Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4566 Week
» 5456 Month
» 313437 Year
» 1197818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3499   26/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3944   02/06/1946
BR 63944 w/e 03/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1592
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Mon 26/04/1924 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 03/04/1961 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 04/1961 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 26/04/1924
DON Doncaster 30/11/1945
FRO Frodingham 20/10/1947
36A Doncaster 13/06/1954
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 10/02/1957
   Withdrawn 03/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   03/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/04/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7713)
15/08/1931 Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
09/12/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8184)
16/10/1937 Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
27/01/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8972)
11/03/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8456)
05/10/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21035)
04/06/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21012)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 13/03/1925 05/04/1925 24 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 04/12/1926 12/03/1927 99 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/02/1929 23/03/1929 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/07/1931 15/08/1931 43 days General
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
 
Doncaster Works 04/11/1933 09/12/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/08/1935 07/09/1935 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/09/1937 16/10/1937 22 days General
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
 
Doncaster Works 16/12/1939 27/01/1940 43 days General
Boiler number 8972 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/12/1941 17/01/1942 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/01/1944 12/02/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/05/1947 11/07/1947 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/03/1948 31/03/1948 20 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63944
 
Doncaster Works 31/01/1949 11/03/1949 40 days General
Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/09/1951 05/10/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 20/12/1951 07/01/1952 19 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 09/05/1954 04/06/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 21012 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 16/07/1956 23/08/1956 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/03/1959 24/04/1959 44 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1960 23/12/1960 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 27/03/1961 03/04/1961 8 days No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/04/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 3499
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1592
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
13/03/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1925. Dep: 05/04/1925.    
04/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927.    
09/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929.    
04/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
   
04/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2)
   
03/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 07/09/1935.    
25/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
   
16/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 27/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8972 (Diagram 2)
   
06/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942.    
08/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944.    
30/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3944    
30/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1947. Dep: 11/07/1947.    
20/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
12/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1948. Dep: 31/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63944
   
31/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1949. Dep: 11/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2)
   
03/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 05/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2)
   
20/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 07/01/1952.    
09/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1954. Dep: 04/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21012 (Diagram 2)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1956. Dep: 23/08/1956.    
10/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
12/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959.    
14/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1960. Dep: 23/12/1960.    
27/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/03/1961. Dep: 03/04/1961.    
04/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
03/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63944 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev