Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 847 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3162 Week
» 31120 Month
» 65762 Year
» 1287327 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 500   22/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3945   05/09/1946
BR 63945 w/e 23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O2/222/05/1924
O2/423/11/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1594
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 22/05/1924 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
Service Life 39 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 22/05/1924
DON Doncaster 30/11/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 15/12/1946
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
36C Frodingham 12/04/1953
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/01/1954
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 15/12/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 23/01/1954
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/05/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7714)
28/01/1925 Dabeg Feed Water Heater fitted
09/12/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7709)
26/02/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7717)
05/12/1942 Dabeg Feed Water Heater removed
05/12/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9014)
25/10/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8855)
08/05/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9471)
30/05/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21050)
20/08/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21026)
23/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28500)
07/08/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28959)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 10/10/1900 23/11/1956 20499 days General
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28500 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 500
 
Doncaster Works 20/12/1924 28/01/1925 40 days Light Repair
Dabeg Feed Water Heater fitted
 
Doncaster Works 15/07/1925 26/09/1925 74 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/01/1927 21/05/1927 111 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/05/1929 08/06/1929 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/08/1931 29/08/1931 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/11/1933 09/12/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 7709 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 14/12/1935 18/01/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/02/1938 26/02/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1940 13/07/1940 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/10/1942 05/12/1942 50 days General
Boiler number 9014 (Diagram 2)
Dabeg Feed Water Heater removed
 
Doncaster Works 02/12/1944 06/01/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/01/1945 24/01/1945 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 26/10/1946 04/12/1946 40 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/09/1948 25/10/1948 44 days General
Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63945
 
Doncaster Works 04/04/1950 08/05/1950 35 days General
Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 05/05/1952 30/05/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 21050 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 10/09/1952 09/10/1952 30 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 28/07/1954 20/08/1954 24 days General
Boiler number 21026 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/07/1959 07/08/1959 30 days General
Boiler number 28959 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 09/02/1962 15/03/1962 35 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/03/1962 30/03/1962 12 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/10/1900 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1900. Dep: 23/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28500 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 500
   
22/05/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 500
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1594
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
20/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/12/1924. Dep: 28/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Dabeg Feed Water Heater fitted
   
15/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/07/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925.    
31/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927.    
04/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.    
01/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.    
04/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7709 (Diagram 2)
   
14/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.    
05/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 26/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2)
   
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940.    
17/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9014 (Diagram 2)
Dabeg Feed Water Heater removed
   
02/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945.    
21/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1945. Dep: 24/01/1945.    
30/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 04/12/1946.    
15/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
12/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1948. Dep: 25/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63945
   
04/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1950. Dep: 08/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2)
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
05/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1952. Dep: 30/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21050 (Diagram 2)
   
10/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1952. Dep: 09/10/1952.    
12/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
03/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
28/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1954. Dep: 20/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21026 (Diagram 2)
   
09/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28959 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
09/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1962. Dep: 15/03/1962.    
19/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1962. Dep: 30/03/1962.    
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63945 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest    

prev prev