|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1935 | 04/09/1935 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1937 | 22/05/1937 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1938 | 22/10/1938 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1942 | 14/02/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9469 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1947 | 10/08/1947 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1948 | 30/04/1948 | 38 days | Heavy | Boiler number 9013 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63958 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9322 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1951 | 01/03/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 21015 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1953 | 26/07/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1955 | 15/08/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1956 | 02/11/1956 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21037 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/12/1933 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2433 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1784 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
02/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1935. Dep: 04/09/1935. | ||
29/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1937. Dep: 22/05/1937. | ||
01/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938. | ||
30/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. | ||
17/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1942. Dep: 14/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2) |
||
28/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. | ||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9469 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. | ||
16/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3958 | ||
27/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1947. Dep: 10/08/1947. | ||
24/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/03/1948. Dep: 30/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9013 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63958 |
||
11/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9322 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1951. Dep: 01/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21015 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1953. Dep: 26/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1955. Dep: 15/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21002 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1956. Dep: 02/11/1956. | ||
23/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21037 (Diagram 2) |
||
04/05/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63958 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
06/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |