|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1935 | 25/09/1935 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1935 | 22/02/1936 | 61 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1937 | 14/08/1937 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 9014 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1937 | 02/11/1937 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1942 | 19/09/1942 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8457 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 9012 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1948 | 18/06/1948 | 26 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63961 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1949 | 04/10/1949 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1949 | 27/01/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1952 | 02/07/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1954 | 11/11/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21028 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1957 | 14/06/1957 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1959 | 07/03/1959 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1960 | 23/02/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28394 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Waiting Works) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/02/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2436 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1787 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
16/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1935. Dep: 25/09/1935. | ||
24/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/12/1935. Dep: 22/02/1936. | ||
11/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9014 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 02/11/1937. | ||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. | ||
01/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. | ||
29/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8457 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9012 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3961 | ||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 18/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63961 |
||
10/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1949. Dep: 04/10/1949. | ||
31/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1949. Dep: 27/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9240 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1952. Dep: 02/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
03/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
12/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1954. Dep: 11/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21028 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1957. Dep: 14/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1959. Dep: 07/03/1959. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1960. Dep: 23/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28394 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63961 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |