|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1947 | 13/07/1947 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1950 | 13/04/1950 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 9363 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63963 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1952 | 17/09/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 21021 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1954 | 22/12/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1955 | 14/02/1955 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1958 | 20/02/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1959 | 04/11/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1961 | 26/01/1961 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1961 | 17/06/1961 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/05/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3833 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1931 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
24/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
11/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3963 | ||
30/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1947. Dep: 13/07/1947. | ||
20/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
20/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1950. Dep: 13/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9363 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63963 |
||
10/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1952. Dep: 17/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21021 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
23/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1954. Dep: 22/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1955. Dep: 14/02/1955. | ||
19/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1958. Dep: 20/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
26/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 04/11/1959. | ||
25/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1961. Dep: 26/01/1961. | ||
12/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1961. Dep: 17/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2) |
||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63963 from Grantham (34F) |