Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 349 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 349 Week
» 17685 Month
» 295481 Year
» 1179862 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3834   10/06/1942
LNER (1946) 3964   11/08/1946
BR 63964 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1932
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 10/06/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 03/1964 at Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 10/06/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
DON Doncaster 09/12/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31/01/1960
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   30/10/1959
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/06/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9315)
28/09/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4401)
10/08/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9316)
10/03/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21064)
18/08/1956 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21042)
17/03/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 28331)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 18/12/1943 25/12/1943 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 22/07/1944 12/08/1944 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/08/1946 28/09/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 4401 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/04/1948 12/05/1948 37 days General
Renumbered to BR 63964
 
Doncaster Works 18/07/1950 10/08/1950 24 days General
Boiler number 9316 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 10/02/1953 10/03/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 21064 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 07/06/1955 08/07/1955 32 days Heavy Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/07/1956 18/08/1956 34 days General
Boiler number 21042 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 10/02/1961 17/03/1961 36 days General
Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/06/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3834
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1932
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
18/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944.    
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3964    
31/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4401 (Diagram 2)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
06/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1948. Dep: 12/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63964
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
18/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1950. Dep: 10/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9316 (Diagram 2)
   
10/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 10/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21064 (Diagram 2)
   
07/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955.    
16/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21042 (Diagram 2)
   
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
10/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 17/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 2)
   
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63964 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest    

prev prev