|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 4401 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1948 | 12/05/1948 | 37 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63964 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1950 | 10/08/1950 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 9316 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1953 | 10/03/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21064 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1955 | 08/07/1955 | 32 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1956 | 18/08/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21042 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1961 | 17/03/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/06/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3834 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1932 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
18/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
22/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. | ||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3964 | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4401 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
06/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1948. Dep: 12/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63964 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
18/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1950. Dep: 10/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9316 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 10/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21064 (Diagram 2) |
||
07/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955. | ||
16/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21042 (Diagram 2) |
||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
10/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 17/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63964 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |