Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 177 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4173 Week
» 11357 Month
» 319338 Year
» 1203719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3835   26/06/1942
LNER (1946) 3965   02/06/1946
BR 63965 w/e 12/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1933
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Wed 26/06/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Wed 10/10/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 20 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 26/06/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
35B Grantham 18/06/1950
36B Mexborough 28/10/1951
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 17/02/1952
   Withdrawn 10/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
ALLOC 35B Grantham m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   10/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/06/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9316)
09/11/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9364)
01/08/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21055)
05/11/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21058)
26/01/1957 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21035)
05/09/1959 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 28963)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 19/09/1942 10/10/1942 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/02/1943 27/02/1943 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/06/1944 15/07/1944 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/06/1947 03/08/1947 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/10/1949 09/11/1949 32 days General
Boiler number 9364 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63965
 
Doncaster Works 07/07/1952 01/08/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/10/1954 05/11/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 21058 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/12/1956 26/01/1957 43 days General
Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/08/1959 05/09/1959 31 days General
Boiler number 28963 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/08/1961 14/10/1961 50 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/06/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3835
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1933
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
19/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.    
06/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944.    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3965    
29/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1947. Dep: 03/08/1947.    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
09/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1949. Dep: 09/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9364 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63965
   
18/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
28/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
07/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1952. Dep: 01/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2)
   
06/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1954. Dep: 05/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21058 (Diagram 2)
   
15/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2)
   
06/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28963 (Diagram 2)
   
26/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961.    
10/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63965 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev