Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 18375 Month
» 296171 Year
» 1180552 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3837   21/08/1942
LNER (1946) 3967   15/09/1946
BR 63967 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1935
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Mon 21/08/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 20 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 21/08/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 20/10/1946
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
   Withdrawn 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/08/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9318)
05/11/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9241)
05/01/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21012)
18/09/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21069)
03/11/1956 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21046)
03/07/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21008)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 25/11/1944 23/12/1944 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/11/1946 11/01/1947 61 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/04/1947 30/05/1947 38 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/09/1948 05/11/1948 39 days General
Boiler number 9241 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63967
 
Doncaster Works 03/12/1948 20/12/1948 18 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 16/12/1949 29/12/1949 14 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 11/12/1950 05/01/1951 26 days General
Boiler number 21012 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 14/08/1953 18/09/1953 36 days General
Boiler number 21069 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 30/09/1956 03/11/1956 35 days General
Boiler number 21046 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 14/05/1958 05/06/1958 23 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 23/05/1961 03/07/1961 42 days General
Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/11/1962 09/11/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/08/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3837
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1935
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944.    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3967    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
12/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947.    
23/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1947. Dep: 30/05/1947.    
28/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1948. Dep: 05/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9241 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63967
   
03/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1948. Dep: 20/12/1948.    
16/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1949. Dep: 29/12/1949.    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
11/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1950. Dep: 05/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21012 (Diagram 2)
   
14/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 18/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21069 (Diagram 2)
   
30/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21046 (Diagram 2)
   
14/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1958. Dep: 05/06/1958.    
23/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1961. Dep: 03/07/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21008 (Diagram 2)
   
09/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/11/1962. Dep: 09/11/1962.    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63967 from Doncaster (36A)    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev