Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 751 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1791 Week
» 11961 Month
» 289757 Year
» 1174138 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3838   02/09/1942
LNER (1946) 3968   01/09/1946
BR 63968 w/e 17/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O2/402/09/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1936
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 02/09/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 21 yrs , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 02/09/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 09/12/1962
34F Grantham 30/12/1962
36A Doncaster 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/09/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9319)
16/07/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8976)
29/12/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21011)
10/11/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21062)
29/09/1955 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21068)
03/06/1958 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21070)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 26/12/1942 16/01/1943 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/07/1943 31/07/1943 29 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 23/12/1944 03/02/1945 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/11/1946 23/11/1946 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/06/1948 16/07/1948 38 days General
Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63968
 
Doncaster Works 06/12/1950 29/12/1950 24 days General
Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 13/10/1952 10/11/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 21062 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 02/11/1954 25/11/1954 24 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 22/08/1955 29/09/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 21068 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/05/1958 03/06/1958 34 days General
Boiler number 21070 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/11/1960 01/12/1960 13 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 22/02/1961 25/03/1961 32 days General
Rebuilt to class O2/4
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/09/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3838
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1936
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
26/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943.    
03/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 03/02/1945.    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3968    
02/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
09/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63968
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
06/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 29/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2)
   
13/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 10/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21062 (Diagram 2)
   
02/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1954. Dep: 25/11/1954.    
22/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21068 (Diagram 2)
   
01/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1958. Dep: 03/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21070 (Diagram 2)
   
19/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1960. Dep: 01/12/1960.    
22/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O2/4
   
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63968 from Doncaster (36A)    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev