Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3839   12/09/1942
LNER (1946) 3969   08/09/1946
BR 63969 w/e 26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1937
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 12/09/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Sun 03/11/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 12/09/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 20/10/1946
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36A Doncaster 18/03/1951
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31/01/1960
   Withdrawn 03/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   03/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/09/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9320)
25/03/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9323)
24/10/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21038)
25/09/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21006)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 23/12/1944 03/02/1945 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/12/1945 15/12/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/11/1946 11/01/1947 61 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/01/1947 01/03/1947 38 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 20/02/1949 25/03/1949 34 days General
Boiler number 9323 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63969
 
Doncaster Works 28/09/1951 24/10/1951 27 days General
Boiler number 21038 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 14/08/1953 25/09/1953 43 days General
Boiler number 21006 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/12/1955 31/12/1955 31 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/10/1957 08/10/1957 5 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 17/10/1960 05/11/1960 20 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 31/08/1961 23/11/1961 85 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/01/1963 20/02/1963 36 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/09/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3839
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1937
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 03/02/1945.    
08/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945.    
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3969    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
12/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947.    
23/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947.    
20/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1949. Dep: 25/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9323 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63969
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
28/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1951. Dep: 24/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21038 (Diagram 2)
   
14/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 25/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21006 (Diagram 2)
   
01/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1955. Dep: 31/12/1955.    
04/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/10/1957. Dep: 08/10/1957.    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
17/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960.    
31/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1961. Dep: 23/11/1961.    
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. SLS 1/1962 Link
16/01/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1963. Dep: 20/02/1963.    
03/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63969 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev