|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1944 | 03/02/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1949 | 25/03/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9323 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63969 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1951 | 24/10/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21038 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1953 | 25/09/1953 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 21006 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1955 | 31/12/1955 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1957 | 08/10/1957 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1960 | 05/11/1960 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1961 | 23/11/1961 | 85 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1963 | 20/02/1963 | 36 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
10/01/1962 | Doncaster MPD | Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed: D3447, D5823 (new), 43160, 60525, 62007, 63969, 70000. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/09/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3839 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1937 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 03/02/1945. | ||
08/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3969 | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
12/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. | ||
23/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. | ||
20/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1949. Dep: 25/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9323 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63969 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1951. Dep: 24/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21038 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 25/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21006 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1955. Dep: 31/12/1955. | ||
04/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/10/1957. Dep: 08/10/1957. | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
17/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960. | ||
31/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1961. Dep: 23/11/1961. | ||
16/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1963. Dep: 20/02/1963. | ||
03/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63969 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |