Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 465 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 465 Week
» 17801 Month
» 295597 Year
» 1179978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3840   21/09/1942
LNER (1946) 3970   21/09/1946
BR (Tmp) E3970   06/02/1948
BR 63970 w/e 08/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1938
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Mon 21/09/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 09/05/1960 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 06/1960 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 17 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 21/09/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 20/10/1946
ANN Annesley 20/02/1948
LNG Langwith Junction 07/03/1948
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/08/1951
   Withdrawn 09/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 11/08/1951
WDN   09/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/09/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9321)
06/02/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8974)
05/04/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9320)
17/10/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21060)
20/12/1957 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21052)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 30/09/1942 03/10/1942 4 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 17/03/1945 21/04/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/08/1946 21/09/1946 36 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3970
 
Doncaster Works 06/01/1948 06/02/1948 32 days General
Boiler number 8974 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3970
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1950 05/04/1950 51 days General
Boiler number 9320 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63970
 
Doncaster Works 24/09/1952 17/10/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 21060 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 14/12/1954 19/01/1955 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/11/1957 20/12/1957 40 days General
Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 24/04/1959 30/04/1959 7 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 22/04/1960 22/04/1960 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/09/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3840
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1938
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
30/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.    
17/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3970
   
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
06/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1948. Dep: 06/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8974 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3970
   
20/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
07/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
14/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1950. Dep: 05/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9320 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63970
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
05/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
24/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1952. Dep: 17/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21060 (Diagram 2)
   
14/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1954. Dep: 19/01/1955.    
11/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1957. Dep: 20/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2)
   
24/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959.    
22/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/04/1960. Dep: 22/04/1960.    
09/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 63970 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
06/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev