Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3843   23/10/1942
LNER (1946) 3973   22/09/1946
BR 63973 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1941
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 23/10/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 23/10/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 20/10/1946
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36A Doncaster 27/08/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 16/10/1960
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/10/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9385)
11/05/1947 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8975)
08/07/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9465)
30/10/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21039)
18/12/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21029)
11/02/1956 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21007)
18/08/1958 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21027)
16/12/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21009)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 13/02/1943 20/02/1943 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/10/1944 21/10/1944 15 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/02/1945 24/03/1945 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 23/03/1947 11/05/1947 50 days General
Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 29/05/1947 13/06/1947 16 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1948 30/11/1948 31 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63973
 
Doncaster Works 02/06/1949 08/07/1949 37 days General
Boiler number 9465 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 27/09/1951 30/10/1951 34 days General
Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/11/1953 18/12/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 21029 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 08/01/1956 11/02/1956 35 days General
Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 16/07/1958 18/08/1958 34 days General
Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 27/07/1959 08/08/1959 13 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 22/09/1961 16/12/1961 86 days General
Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/10/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3843
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1941
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
13/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.    
10/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945.    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3973    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
23/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1947. Dep: 11/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2)
   
29/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1947. Dep: 13/06/1947.    
31/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1948. Dep: 30/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63973
   
02/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1949. Dep: 08/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9465 (Diagram 2)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 30/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2)
   
19/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 18/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21029 (Diagram 2)
   
08/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2)
   
16/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1958. Dep: 18/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2)
   
27/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959.    
16/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
22/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1961. Dep: 16/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63973 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest    

prev prev