|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1945 | 24/03/1945 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1947 | 11/05/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1947 | 13/06/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1948 | 30/11/1948 | 31 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63973 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1949 | 08/07/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 9465 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1951 | 30/10/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1953 | 18/12/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21029 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1958 | 18/08/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1959 | 08/08/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1961 | 16/12/1961 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | General Observations | N.E. Area have revealed quite a few strange -locos. that have been seen. Two 'J.6's' were noted on a recent trip to West Hartlepool, one being 3547 in Newport yard. A 'Q.4' from Barnsley was outside the shed at WHL in addition to the usual one or two 'O.4's,' At Darlington, 'B.7' 5031 was noted on a down goods, followed by 3843, one of the new 'O.2's.' | SLS/194302 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/10/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3843 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1941 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
13/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. | ||
10/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945. | ||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3973 | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
23/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1947. Dep: 11/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1947. Dep: 13/06/1947. | ||
31/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1948. Dep: 30/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63973 |
||
02/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1949. Dep: 08/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9465 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
27/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 30/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 18/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21029 (Diagram 2) |
||
08/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1958. Dep: 18/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959. | ||
16/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
22/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1961. Dep: 16/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63973 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |