|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3976 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1947 | 16/07/1947 | 36 days | Heavy | Boiler number 9315 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1948 | 20/05/1948 | 37 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63976 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1950 | 12/07/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9164 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1951 | 12/06/1951 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1952 | 02/01/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1954 | 02/07/1954 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1955 | 20/05/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21056 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1958 | 01/03/1958 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1960 | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/11/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3846 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1944 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
05/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. | ||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. | ||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
28/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3976 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
11/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/06/1947. Dep: 16/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9315 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1948. Dep: 20/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63976 |
||
02/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1950. Dep: 12/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9164 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
04/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 12/06/1951. | ||
11/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
04/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954. | ||
19/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1955. Dep: 20/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21056 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
04/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/12/1960 | Modification | Diagram 100A number 28364 boiler fitted | ||
16/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: 16/12/1960. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63976 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |