Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 708 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4529 Week
» 21865 Month
» 299661 Year
» 1184042 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3848   28/11/1942
LNER (1946) 3978   14/12/1946
BR 63978 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1946
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Tue 28/11/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Tue 07/05/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 28/11/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 20/10/1946
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36A Doncaster 18/03/1951
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 16/09/1962
   Withdrawn 07/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   07/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/11/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9390)
19/02/1947 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8183)
05/09/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21033)
28/08/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21015)
16/07/1955 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21014)
21/03/1958 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21056)
16/02/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21067)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 24/02/1945 24/03/1945 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/01/1947 19/02/1947 46 days General
Boiler number 8183 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 05/11/1947 10/12/1947 36 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 20/01/1948 06/02/1948 18 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/04/1949 06/05/1949 31 days General
Renumbered to BR 63978
 
Doncaster Works 11/08/1951 05/09/1951 26 days General
Boiler number 21033 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/07/1953 28/08/1953 34 days General
Boiler number 21015 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 08/06/1955 16/07/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 21014 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 17/05/1957 29/05/1957 13 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/02/1958 21/03/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 21056 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/08/1959 28/08/1959 11 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 13/01/1961 16/02/1961 35 days General
Boiler number 21067 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 05/03/1963 13/03/1963 9 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/11/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3848
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1946
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945.    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
14/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3978    
05/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1947. Dep: 19/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8183 (Diagram 2)
   
05/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/11/1947. Dep: 10/12/1947.    
20/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1948. Dep: 06/02/1948.    
06/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1949. Dep: 06/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63978
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
11/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1951. Dep: 05/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21033 (Diagram 2)
   
26/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1953. Dep: 28/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21015 (Diagram 2)
   
08/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1955. Dep: 16/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21014 (Diagram 2)
   
17/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1957. Dep: 29/05/1957.    
14/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21056 (Diagram 2)
   
18/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959.    
13/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1961. Dep: 16/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21067 (Diagram 2)
   
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
05/03/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1963. Dep: 13/03/1963.    
07/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63978 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev