Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 18375 Month
» 296171 Year
» 1180552 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3849   04/12/1942
LNER (1946) 3979   22/11/1946
BR (Tmp) E3979   23/01/1948
BR 63979 w/e 15/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O2/404/12/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1947
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Mon 04/12/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 10/09/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 19 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 04/12/1942
CLK Colwick 25/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36A Doncaster 18/03/1951
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 17/08/1952
   Withdrawn 10/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 06/09/1952
WDN   10/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/12/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9391)
30/11/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9160)
17/01/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9243)
12/11/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21041)
10/03/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21001)
30/08/1956 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21064)
13/06/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28111)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 17/03/1945 21/04/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/11/1946 30/11/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3979
 
Doncaster Works 28/12/1947 23/01/1948 27 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3979
 
Doncaster Works 13/12/1948 17/01/1949 36 days General
Boiler number 9243 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63979
 
Doncaster Works 13/10/1951 12/11/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 21041 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 11/02/1954 10/03/1954 28 days General
Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/07/1956 30/08/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 21064 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/05/1959 13/06/1959 30 days General
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 20/12/1960 06/01/1961 18 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 03/09/1962 03/09/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/12/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3849
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1947
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
25/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.    
09/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3979
   
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
28/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/12/1947. Dep: 23/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3979
   
13/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1948. Dep: 17/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9243 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63979
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
13/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 12/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21041 (Diagram 2)
   
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
11/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1954. Dep: 10/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21001 (Diagram 2)
   
26/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1956. Dep: 30/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21064 (Diagram 2)
   
15/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1959. Dep: 13/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961.    
03/09/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/09/1962. Dep: 03/09/1962.    
10/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63979 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev