|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1945 | 31/03/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1947 | 24/12/1947 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1948 | 16/04/1948 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63980 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1949 | 31/05/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 4407 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1951 | 28/11/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 21042 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1954 | 26/03/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21036 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1956 | 05/07/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21005 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1959 | 13/11/1959 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1961 | 31/01/1961 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1961 | 22/11/1961 | 105 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Boiler Park) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/12/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3850 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1948 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3980 | ||
12/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. | ||
18/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1947. Dep: 24/12/1947. | ||
07/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1948. Dep: 16/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63980 |
||
05/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1949. Dep: 31/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4407 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
25/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1951. Dep: 28/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21042 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21036 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1956. Dep: 05/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21005 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. | ||
26/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959. | ||
30/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 31/01/1961. | ||
10/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1961. Dep: 22/11/1961. | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63980 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |