Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3851   17/12/1942
LNER (1946) 3981   20/10/1946
BR 63981 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1949
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 17/12/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Sun 03/11/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 17/12/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 20/10/1946
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36A Doncaster 14/09/1952
34F Grantham 28/10/1962
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn 03/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 34F Grantham w/e 25/10/1962
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   03/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
17/12/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9393)
14/01/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9391)
31/05/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21025)
02/04/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21034)
30/10/1957 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21057)
09/12/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21031)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 08/05/1943 19/06/1943 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 04/03/1944 18/03/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 21/10/1944 04/11/1944 15 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/11/1944 02/12/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/02/1947 24/03/1947 47 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/04/1948 12/05/1948 24 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63981
 
Doncaster Works 29/12/1948 14/01/1949 17 days General
Boiler number 9391 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 02/05/1951 31/05/1951 30 days General
Boiler number 21025 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/03/1954 02/04/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 29/09/1957 30/10/1957 32 days General
Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/03/1961 10/03/1961 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 19/10/1961 09/12/1961 52 days General
Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/12/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3851
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1949
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
08/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944.    
21/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.    
18/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944.    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3981    
06/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1947. Dep: 24/03/1947.    
19/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1948. Dep: 12/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63981
   
29/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1948. Dep: 14/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9391 (Diagram 2)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
02/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1951. Dep: 31/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21025 (Diagram 2)
   
14/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2)
   
29/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2)
   
01/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1961. Dep: 10/03/1961.    
19/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
28/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
03/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63981 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev