Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 714 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 5152 Month
» 313133 Year
» 1197514 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3852   21/12/1942
LNER (1946) 3982   17/10/1946
BR 63982 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O2/421/12/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1950
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 21/12/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Grantham (34F)
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Larkinson F C (Grantham)
Service Life 19 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 21/12/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/08/1951
34F Grantham 20/11/1960
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 26/11/1960
WDN   09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/12/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9394)
24/06/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9390)
15/05/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8855)
16/09/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21057)
10/11/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21055)
09/08/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28352)
27/02/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28570)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 27/03/1943 10/04/1943 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 04/11/1944 02/12/1944 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/12/1944 20/01/1945 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 26/10/1946 22/11/1946 28 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/05/1948 24/06/1948 31 days General
Boiler number 9390 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63982
 
Doncaster Works 16/04/1950 15/05/1950 30 days General
Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 30/04/1951 10/05/1951 11 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 08/08/1952 16/09/1952 40 days General
Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/01/1953 12/02/1953 41 days CH  
Doncaster Works 15/10/1954 10/11/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/08/1956 04/08/1956 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 01/07/1957 09/08/1957 40 days General
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28352 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 23/01/1960 27/02/1960 36 days General
Boiler number 28570 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 01/02/1961 03/02/1961 3 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3852
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1950
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
27/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944.    
30/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945.    
17/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3982    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 22/11/1946.    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
25/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9390 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63982
   
16/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1950. Dep: 15/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
30/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1951. Dep: 10/05/1951.    
05/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
08/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1952. Dep: 16/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2)
   
03/01/1953 Works Visit      
15/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1954. Dep: 10/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2)
   
01/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956.    
01/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 09/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28352 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1960. Dep: 27/02/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28570 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
01/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1961. Dep: 03/02/1961.    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63982 from Grantham (34F)    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Larkinson F C : Grantham    

prev prev