Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 112 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 18373 Month
» 296169 Year
» 1180550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3853   26/12/1942
LNER (1946) 3983   04/05/1946
BR 63983 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O2/426/12/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1951
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Tue 26/12/1942 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Tue 02/07/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 08/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 20 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 26/12/1942
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 20/10/1946
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36C Frodingham 17/08/1952
36A Doncaster 13/06/1954
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 16/10/1960
   Withdrawn 02/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   02/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/12/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9395)
25/11/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9245)
04/04/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21018)
14/11/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21024)
21/07/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28190)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 05/05/1945 09/06/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/04/1946 04/05/1946 22 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3983
 
Doncaster Works 19/10/1946 21/12/1946 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/03/1947 04/05/1947 42 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/10/1948 25/11/1948 42 days General
Boiler number 9245 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63983
 
Doncaster Works 05/03/1951 04/04/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 22/10/1953 14/11/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 21024 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 08/06/1956 21/07/1956 44 days General
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28190 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 14/07/1960 20/08/1960 38 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/12/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3853
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1951
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.    
13/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3983
   
19/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 04/05/1947.    
15/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1948. Dep: 25/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9245 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63983
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
05/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21018 (Diagram 2)
   
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
22/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21024 (Diagram 2)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
08/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1956. Dep: 21/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O2/4
Boiler number 28190 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1960. Dep: 20/08/1960.    
16/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
02/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63983 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
08/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev