Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 235 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1334 Week
» 7468 Month
» 235352 Year
» 1456917 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3855 on 02/01/1943
LNER (1946) 3985   04/10/1946
BR 63985 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1953
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 02/01/1943 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 02/01/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
DON Doncaster 09/12/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36C Frodingham 17/08/1952
36A Doncaster 13/06/1954
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 16/09/1962
34F Grantham 30/12/1962
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/01/1943 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9397)
09/02/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9160)
26/04/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21021)
11/02/1952 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21047)
21/05/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21031)
13/06/1958 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21010)
06/05/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21059)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1949 Doncaster Works Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. SLS/194903
23/04/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. SLS/196106

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 05/05/1945 02/06/1945 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/02/1947 28/03/1947 47 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/05/1948 21/05/1948 17 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63985
 
Doncaster Works 06/01/1949 09/02/1949 35 days General
Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/04/1951 26/04/1951 24 days General
Boiler number 21021 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 11/05/1951 25/05/1951 15 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 10/01/1952 11/02/1952 33 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 21047 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/04/1954 21/05/1954 26 days General
Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 24/09/1956 01/11/1956 39 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/05/1958 13/06/1958 31 days General
Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 29/09/1960 08/10/1960 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 03/04/1961 06/05/1961 34 days General
Boiler number 21059 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/01/1943 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3855
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1953
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945.    
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
04/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3985    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1947. Dep: 28/03/1947.    
05/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63985
   
06/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 09/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9160 (Diagram 2)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
03/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1951. Dep: 26/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21021 (Diagram 2)
   
11/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1951. Dep: 25/05/1951.    
10/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1952. Dep: 11/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21047 (Diagram 2)
   
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
26/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1954. Dep: 21/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
24/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1956. Dep: 01/11/1956.    
14/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1958. Dep: 13/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21010 (Diagram 2)
   
29/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960.    
03/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21059 (Diagram 2)
   
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63985 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev