Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 758 Today
» 1106 Yesterday
» 7910 Week
» 27555 Month
» 62197 Year
» 1283762 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3856   07/01/1943
LNER (1946) 3986   17/11/1946
BR 63986 w/e 09/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1954
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Fri 07/01/1943 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Fri 07/06/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 08/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 20 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 07/01/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 29/03/1944
DON Doncaster 18/12/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
36B Mexborough 02/07/1950
36A Doncaster 27/08/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 17/08/1952
   Withdrawn 07/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 06/09/1952
WDN   07/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/01/1943 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9398)
05/07/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9393)
29/11/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21009)
24/10/1953 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21038)
05/12/1958 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21063)
28/02/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21052)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 06/01/1945 24/02/1945 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/03/1947 06/05/1947 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/05/1949 05/07/1949 38 days General
Boiler number 9393 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63986
 
Doncaster Works 23/10/1950 29/11/1950 38 days General
Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 20/09/1953 24/10/1953 35 days General
Boiler number 21038 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/03/1955 13/04/1955 44 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 08/12/1955 10/01/1956 34 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/10/1958 05/12/1958 39 days General
Boiler number 21063 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 30/01/1961 28/02/1961 30 days General
Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 12/09/1961 19/09/1961 8 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/01/1943 To Service To service as LNER Number 3856
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1954
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
06/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945.    
18/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3986    
23/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1947. Dep: 06/05/1947.    
29/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1949. Dep: 05/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9393 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63986
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
23/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1950. Dep: 29/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2)
   
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
20/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1953. Dep: 24/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21038 (Diagram 2)
   
01/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 13/04/1955.    
08/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1955. Dep: 10/01/1956.    
28/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1958. Dep: 05/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21063 (Diagram 2)
   
30/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 28/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21052 (Diagram 2)
   
12/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 19/09/1961.    
07/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63986 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
08/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev