Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 943 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5074 Week
» 15244 Month
» 293040 Year
» 1177421 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3857   21/01/1943
LNER (1946) 3987   19/04/1946
BR 63987 w/e 18/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O2
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number -
Works Number 1955
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brakes fitted
To Service Sun 21/01/1943 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 03/1964 at Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 21/01/1943
CLK Colwick 23/01/1944
NWE New England 29/03/1944
DON Doncaster 18/12/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 20/02/1948
LNG Langwith Junction 07/03/1948
36B Mexborough 07/02/1950
36A Doncaster 27/08/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 17/08/1952
34F Grantham 30/12/1962
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 08/09/1963
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/01/1943 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9399)
16/06/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9386)
26/09/1951 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21034)
15/02/1954 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21027)
24/04/1956 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21039)
30/12/1958 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21009)
14/12/1961 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21057)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 09/06/1945 21/07/1945 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/03/1946 20/04/1946 22 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3987
 
Doncaster Works 31/08/1946 07/09/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 27/07/1947 28/08/1947 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/05/1949 16/06/1949 30 days General
Boiler number 9386 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63987
 
Doncaster Works 26/08/1951 26/09/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 20/01/1954 15/02/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 05/03/1956 24/04/1956 51 days General
Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/11/1958 30/12/1958 35 days General
Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 25/06/1959 16/07/1959 22 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/10/1959 09/10/1959 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 30/10/1961 14/12/1961 46 days General
Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/01/1943 To Service To service as LNER Number 3857
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1955
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
09/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945.    
18/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
30/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 20/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3987
   
31/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946.    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1947. Dep: 28/08/1947.    
20/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
07/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
18/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1949. Dep: 16/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9386 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63987
   
07/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1951. Dep: 26/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2)
   
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
20/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1954. Dep: 15/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21027 (Diagram 2)
   
05/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 24/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2)
   
26/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1958. Dep: 30/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21009 (Diagram 2)
   
25/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 16/07/1959.    
05/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1959. Dep: 09/10/1959.    
30/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1961. Dep: 14/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63987 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest    

prev