Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 456 m/e 12/1913
LNER (1924) 3456   12/12/1924
LNER (1946) 3475   22/12/1946
BR 63475 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O312/1913
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1411
To Service During 12/1913 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Tue 24/07/1951 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 07/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 37 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 12/1913
HSY Hornsey 23/06/1930
NWE New England 26/02/1931
MEX Mexborough 31/05/1937
DON Doncaster 04/01/1938
FRO Frodingham 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster 17/01/1948
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 27/08/1950
   Withdrawn 24/07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 27/08/1950
WDN   24/07/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1913 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7234)
24/09/1927 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7239)
05/11/1932 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7690)
26/01/1935 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7713)
14/03/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7718)
23/05/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8463)
25/05/1947 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9396)
04/11/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4404)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 05/04/1922 19/08/1922 137 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/08/1924 12/12/1924 108 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3456
 
Doncaster Works 25/01/1926 26/04/1926 92 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/07/1927 24/09/1927 81 days General
Boiler number 7239 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/02/1928 24/03/1928 39 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/12/1929 11/02/1930 67 days General  
Gorton Works 22/07/1932 05/11/1932 107 days General
Boiler number 7690 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1934 26/01/1935 66 days General
Boiler number 7713 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/11/1935 08/01/1936 44 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/02/1938 14/03/1938 37 days General
Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/02/1940 08/04/1940 68 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/03/1942 23/05/1942 63 days General
Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 29/05/1943 14/08/1943 78 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 13/09/1943 29/09/1943 17 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Doncaster Works 09/03/1945 21/04/1945 44 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/09/1946 19/10/1946 31 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 27/02/1947 25/05/1947 88 days General
Boiler number 9396 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/09/1949 04/01/1949 -256 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service To service as GNR Number 456
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1411
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
05/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1922. Dep: 19/08/1922.    
27/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1924. Dep: 12/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3456
   
25/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1926. Dep: 26/04/1926.    
06/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7239 (Diagram 2)
   
15/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1928. Dep: 24/03/1928.    
07/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1929. Dep: 11/02/1930.    
23/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
26/02/1931 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
22/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7690 (Diagram 2)
   
22/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1934. Dep: 26/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7713 (Diagram 2)
   
26/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1935. Dep: 08/01/1936.    
31/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
04/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1938. Dep: 14/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2)
   
01/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1940. Dep: 08/04/1940.    
22/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2)
   
29/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.    
13/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1943. Dep: 29/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
09/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
19/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946.    
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3475    
27/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1947. Dep: 25/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9396 (Diagram 2)
   
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1949. Dep: 04/01/1949.    
04/11/1949 Modification Diagram 2 number 4404 boiler fitted    
04/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 63475    
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
07/1951 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
24/07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63475 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev