|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1922 | 19/08/1922 | 137 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1924 | 12/12/1924 | 108 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3456 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1926 | 26/04/1926 | 92 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1927 | 24/09/1927 | 81 days | General | Boiler number 7239 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1928 | 24/03/1928 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1929 | 11/02/1930 | 67 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1932 | 05/11/1932 | 107 days | General | Boiler number 7690 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1934 | 26/01/1935 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 7713 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1935 | 08/01/1936 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1938 | 14/03/1938 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1940 | 08/04/1940 | 68 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1942 | 23/05/1942 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 78 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1943 | 29/09/1943 | 17 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1947 | 25/05/1947 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 9396 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1949 | 04/01/1949 | -256 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 456 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1411 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
05/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1922. Dep: 19/08/1922. | ||
27/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1924. Dep: 12/12/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3456 |
||
25/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1926. Dep: 26/04/1926. | ||
06/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7239 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1928. Dep: 24/03/1928. | ||
07/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1929. Dep: 11/02/1930. | ||
23/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY) | ||
26/02/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
22/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7690 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1934. Dep: 26/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7713 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1935. Dep: 08/01/1936. | ||
31/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
04/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1938. Dep: 14/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1940. Dep: 08/04/1940. | ||
22/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. | ||
13/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1943. Dep: 29/09/1943. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
09/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
19/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. | ||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3475 | ||
27/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1947. Dep: 25/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9396 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
18/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1949. Dep: 04/01/1949. | ||
04/11/1949 | Modification | Diagram 2 number 4404 boiler fitted | ||
05/11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63475 | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
07/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
24/07/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63475 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |