Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 762 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3448 Week
» 4338 Month
» 312319 Year
» 1196700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 457 m/e 12/1913
LNER (1924) 3457   10/04/1926
LNER (1946) 3476   10/11/1946
BR 63476 w/e 27/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O312/1913
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1412
To Service During 12/1913 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 17/03/1952 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 03/1952 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 12/1913
MEX Mexborough 31/05/1937
DON Doncaster 18/01/1938
GRA Grantham 06/05/1945
DON Doncaster 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham 04/05/1946
DON Doncaster 18/01/1948
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 25/02/1951
   Withdrawn 17/03/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 25/02/1951
WDN   17/03/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1913 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7235)
10/04/1926 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7519)
03/02/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7512)
29/02/1936 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8857)
14/05/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7502)
25/07/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9362)
04/05/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9247)
26/08/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21000)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 24/06/1920 03/07/1920 10 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 25/04/1923 25/08/1923 123 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/02/1926 10/04/1926 69 days General
Boiler number 7519 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3457
 
Doncaster Works 18/05/1928 10/08/1928 85 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/04/1929 01/06/1929 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/07/1931 29/08/1931 50 days General  
Gorton Works 06/01/1934 03/02/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 7512 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/02/1936 29/02/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 23/04/1938 14/05/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 17/02/1940 09/03/1940 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/06/1942 25/07/1942 43 days General
Boiler number 9362 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 13/05/1944 17/06/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/04/1946 04/05/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 9247 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 24/02/1948 27/03/1948 33 days General
Renumbered to BR 63476
 
Doncaster Works 03/07/1950 26/08/1950 55 days General
Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service To service as GNR Number 457
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1412
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
24/06/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920.    
25/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923.    
01/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1926. Dep: 10/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7519 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3457
   
18/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1928. Dep: 10/08/1928.    
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929.    
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.    
06/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1934. Dep: 03/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7512 (Diagram 2)
   
01/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1936. Dep: 29/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2)
   
31/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2)
   
17/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940.    
13/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9362 (Diagram 2)
   
13/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944.    
06/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9247 (Diagram 2)
   
04/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3476    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
24/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1948. Dep: 27/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63476
   
03/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2)
   
25/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
03/1952 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
17/03/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 63476 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev