Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 175 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 175 Week
» 22681 Month
» 325871 Year
» 1547436 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 458 m/e 01/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3458   11/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3477   27/10/1946
British Railways 63477 w/e 17/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O301/1914
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1413
To Service During 01/1914 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 08/10/1951 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 10/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 01/1914
DON Doncaster on 26/08/1939
FRO Frodingham on 25/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 17/01/1948
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 18/03/1951
   Withdrawn on 08/10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOR Borough Gardens w/e 20/03/1948
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   on 08/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1914 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7236)
25/11/1927 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7521)
04/03/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7689)
26/08/1939 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9161)
15/06/1945 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4405)
26/08/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8856)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 06/04/1921 23/07/1921 109 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/10/1923 11/02/1924 123 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3458
 
Doncaster Works 11/06/1925 10/10/1925 122 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/07/1927 25/11/1927 127 days General
Boiler number 7521 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 23/04/1930 18/07/1930 87 days General  
Gorton Works 17/11/1932 04/03/1933 108 days General
Boiler number 7689 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 27/05/1935 29/07/1935 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/03/1937 20/05/1937 68 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/06/1939 26/08/1939 76 days General
Boiler number 9161 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 23/03/1941 30/04/1941 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/12/1942 03/02/1943 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/05/1944 10/06/1944 16 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/05/1945 15/06/1945 35 days General
Boiler number 4405 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 17/03/1946 25/04/1946 40 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/02/1947 04/05/1947 87 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/06/1948 15/07/1948 32 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63477
 
Doncaster Works 18/07/1949 26/08/1949 40 days General
Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1914 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 458
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1413
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
06/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1921. Dep: 23/07/1921.    
12/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1923. Dep: 11/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3458
   
11/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925.    
22/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1927. Dep: 25/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7521 (Diagram 2)
   
23/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1930. Dep: 18/07/1930.    
17/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1932. Dep: 04/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7689 (Diagram 2)
   
27/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1935. Dep: 29/07/1935.    
14/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1937. Dep: 20/05/1937.    
12/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9161 (Diagram 2)
   
26/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1941. Dep: 30/04/1941.    
09/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1942. Dep: 03/02/1943.    
26/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.    
12/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 15/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4405 (Diagram 2)
   
17/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1946. Dep: 25/04/1946.    
25/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3477    
07/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1947. Dep: 04/05/1947.    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/06/1948. Dep: 15/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63477
   
18/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 26/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2)
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
08/10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63477 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev