Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 135 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2120 Week
» 9304 Month
» 317285 Year
» 1201666 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 459 m/e 01/1914
LNER (1924) 3459   11/04/1925
LNER (1946) 3478   05/11/1946
BR 63478 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O301/1914
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1415
To Service During 01/1914 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 15/10/1951 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 10/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 01/1914
CLK Colwick 27/11/1925
NWE New England 19/08/1935
DON Doncaster 07/10/1939
FRO Frodingham 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster 18/01/1948
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/12/1950
   Withdrawn 15/10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   15/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1914 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7237)
04/06/1927 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7238)
13/05/1932 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7505)
07/10/1939 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9163)
08/03/1947 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9390)
01/06/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9471)
24/04/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9396)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 23/02/1922 23/09/1922 213 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/10/1924 11/04/1925 164 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3459
 
Doncaster Works 21/02/1927 04/06/1927 104 days General
Boiler number 7238 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 12/03/1928 18/07/1928 129 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/08/1930 16/10/1930 76 days General  
Gorton Works 08/02/1932 13/05/1932 96 days General
Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1934 27/03/1934 44 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/06/1935 13/07/1935 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/03/1937 26/05/1937 83 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/11/1937 31/12/1937 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/07/1939 07/10/1939 72 days General
Boiler number 9163 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/06/1941 23/07/1941 48 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/03/1942 13/04/1942 38 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/04/1943 15/06/1943 49 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/05/1945 16/06/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/12/1946 08/03/1947 70 days General
Boiler number 9390 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 23/04/1948 01/06/1948 40 days General
Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63478
 
Doncaster Works 04/08/1948 13/08/1948 10 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/03/1950 24/04/1950 49 days General
Boiler number 9396 (Diagram 2)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1914 To Service To service as GNR Number 459
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1415
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
23/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1922. Dep: 23/09/1922.    
30/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1924. Dep: 11/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3459
   
27/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7238 (Diagram 2)
   
12/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1928. Dep: 18/07/1928.    
02/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 16/10/1930.    
08/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1932. Dep: 13/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2)
   
12/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1934. Dep: 27/03/1934.    
06/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935.    
19/08/1935 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
05/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1937. Dep: 26/05/1937.    
19/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937.    
28/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9163 (Diagram 2)
   
07/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1941. Dep: 23/07/1941.    
07/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1942. Dep: 13/04/1942.    
28/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1943. Dep: 15/06/1943.    
12/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
05/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3478    
29/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1946. Dep: 08/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9390 (Diagram 2)
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1948. Dep: 01/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63478
   
04/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948.    
07/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1950. Dep: 24/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9396 (Diagram 2)
   
03/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
10/1951 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
15/10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63478 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev