|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1922 | 23/09/1922 | 213 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1924 | 11/04/1925 | 164 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3459 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1927 | 04/06/1927 | 104 days | General | Boiler number 7238 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1928 | 18/07/1928 | 129 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1930 | 16/10/1930 | 76 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1932 | 13/05/1932 | 96 days | General | Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1934 | 27/03/1934 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1935 | 13/07/1935 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1937 | 26/05/1937 | 83 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1937 | 31/12/1937 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 9163 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1941 | 23/07/1941 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1942 | 13/04/1942 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1943 | 15/06/1943 | 49 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1946 | 08/03/1947 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 9390 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1948 | 01/06/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63478 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1948 | 13/08/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1950 | 24/04/1950 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 9396 (Diagram 2) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 459 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1415 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1922. Dep: 23/09/1922. | ||
30/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1924. Dep: 11/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3459 |
||
27/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7238 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1928. Dep: 18/07/1928. | ||
02/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 16/10/1930. | ||
08/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1932. Dep: 13/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1934. Dep: 27/03/1934. | ||
06/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935. | ||
19/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
05/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1937. Dep: 26/05/1937. | ||
19/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937. | ||
28/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9163 (Diagram 2) |
||
07/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1941. Dep: 23/07/1941. | ||
07/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1942. Dep: 13/04/1942. | ||
28/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1943. Dep: 15/06/1943. | ||
12/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
05/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3478 | ||
29/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1946. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9390 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1948. Dep: 01/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63478 |
||
04/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948. | ||
07/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1950. Dep: 24/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9396 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
10/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
15/10/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63478 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |