Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 237 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5581 Week
» 6471 Month
» 314452 Year
» 1198833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 460 m/e 02/1914
LNER (1924 Tmp) 460N m/e 12/1923
LNER (1924) 3460   30/03/1926
LNER (1946) 3479   11/09/1946
BR (Tmp) E3479   27/02/1948
BR 63479 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O302/1914
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1418
To Service During 02/1914 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Wed 16/05/1951 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 05/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 37 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 02/1914
HSY Hornsey 23/06/1930
NWE New England 01/10/1930
GRA Grantham 20/11/1942
NWE New England 12/03/1944
GRA Grantham 30/09/1944
DON Doncaster 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster 18/01/1948
IMM Immingham 30/05/1948
36A Doncaster 25/06/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 18/03/1951
   Withdrawn 16/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   16/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1914 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7238)
30/03/1926 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7513)
03/05/1930 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7523)
27/10/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number G982)
28/11/1936 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8461)
25/05/1945 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4404)
21/09/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9246)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 18/07/1922 21/09/1922 66 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 10/08/1923 22/12/1923 135 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 460N
 
Doncaster Works 04/01/1926 30/03/1926 86 days General
Boiler number 7513 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3460
 
Doncaster Works 12/11/1927 19/01/1928 69 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/04/1930 03/05/1930 31 days General
Boiler number 7523 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1932 22/04/1932 66 days General  
Gorton Works 09/08/1932 23/09/1932 46 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/01/1933 16/02/1933 44 days 1  
Gorton Works 13/09/1934 27/10/1934 45 days General
Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/09/1936 28/11/1936 71 days General
Boiler number 8461 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 17/06/1938 21/07/1938 35 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/08/1938 20/09/1938 30 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 18/03/1940 27/04/1940 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/04/1943 16/05/1943 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/04/1945 25/05/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/06/1947 01/08/1947 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/08/1947 11/08/1947 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 12/02/1948 27/02/1948 16 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3479
 
Doncaster Works 09/09/1948 08/10/1948 30 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR 63479
 
Doncaster Works 10/08/1949 21/09/1949 43 days General
Boiler number 9246 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/10/1949 05/10/1949 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1914 To Service To service as GNR Number 460
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1418
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
18/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1922. Dep: 21/09/1922.    
10/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 460N
   
04/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1926. Dep: 30/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7513 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3460
   
12/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 19/01/1928.    
03/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7523 (Diagram 2)
   
23/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
01/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
17/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1932. Dep: 22/04/1932.    
09/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1932. Dep: 23/09/1932.    
04/01/1933 Works Visit      
13/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2)
   
19/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8461 (Diagram 2)
   
17/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1938. Dep: 21/07/1938.    
22/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1938. Dep: 20/09/1938.    
18/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.    
20/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
15/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1943. Dep: 16/05/1943.    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
30/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
06/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1945. Dep: 25/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
11/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3479    
18/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1947. Dep: 01/08/1947.    
07/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1947. Dep: 11/08/1947.    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/02/1948. Dep: 27/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3479
   
30/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/09/1948. Dep: 08/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63479
   
10/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1949. Dep: 21/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9246 (Diagram 2)
   
01/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1949. Dep: 05/10/1949.    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
05/1951 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
16/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63479 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev