Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 202 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 202 Week
» 22708 Month
» 325898 Year
» 1547463 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 462 m/e 04/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3462   21/06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3480   27/10/1946
British Railways 63480 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O304/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22060
To Service During 04/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 26/03/1951 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 03/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1900
NWE New England (New) m/e 04/1919
GRA Grantham on 13/11/1942
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
IMM Immingham on 30/05/1948
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 18/03/1951
   Withdrawn on 26/03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   on 26/03/1951
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) m/e 31/03/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7511)
21/06/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7717)
12/08/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7503)
07/07/1937 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8463)
23/11/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9246)
22/04/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9467)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 03/05/1921 03/09/1921 124 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/02/1924 21/06/1924 141 days General
Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3462
 
Doncaster Works 03/05/1926 04/11/1926 186 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/10/1928 22/12/1928 59 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/11/1930 25/02/1931 103 days General  
Gorton Works 01/04/1933 12/08/1933 134 days General
Boiler number 7503 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 31/05/1935 13/08/1935 75 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/04/1937 07/07/1937 91 days General
Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/08/1939 06/10/1939 67 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/09/1940 23/11/1940 77 days General
Air raid damage
Boiler number 9246 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 04/02/1943 30/03/1943 55 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/01/1945 16/03/1945 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/02/1947 08/03/1947 35 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/03/1949 22/04/1949 28 days General
Boiler number 9467 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63480
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1900 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
04/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 462
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22060
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
03/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1921. Dep: 03/09/1921.    
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3462
   
03/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1926. Dep: 04/11/1926.    
25/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928.    
15/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 25/02/1931.    
01/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7503 (Diagram 2)
   
31/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1935. Dep: 13/08/1935.    
08/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1937. Dep: 07/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8463 (Diagram 2)
   
01/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1939. Dep: 06/10/1939.    
08/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Air raid damage
Boiler number 9246 (Diagram 2)
   
13/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
04/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1943. Dep: 30/03/1943.    
31/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1945. Dep: 16/03/1945.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3480    
02/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
30/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
26/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1949. Dep: 22/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9467 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63480
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
26/03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63480 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev