Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1226 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5186 Week
» 34772 Month
» 408785 Year
» 1630350 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 463 m/e 04/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 Tmp) 463N   15/10/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3463   18/03/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3481   27/10/1946
British Railways 63481 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O304/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22061
To Service During 04/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 02/04/1951 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 04/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 32 yrs , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 04/1919
GRA Grantham on 21/11/1942
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 02/04/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 02/04/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7512)
18/03/1926 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7514)
23/05/1928 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7524)
22/05/1930 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7525)
03/12/1932 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7239)
02/06/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7716)
06/12/1939 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7505)
08/02/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7712)
21/12/1944 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9464)
28/01/1949 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8458)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 04/05/1921 20/08/1921 109 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/09/1923 15/10/1923 24 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 463N
 
Doncaster Works 04/01/1926 18/03/1926 74 days General
Boiler number 7514 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3463
 
Doncaster Works 29/02/1928 23/05/1928 85 days General
Boiler number 7524 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 23/03/1930 22/05/1930 61 days General
Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1932 03/12/1932 198 days General
Boiler number 7239 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1934 02/06/1934 90 days General
Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 13/08/1935 04/10/1935 53 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/11/1937 01/12/1937 28 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/04/1939 13/05/1939 38 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/10/1939 06/12/1939 62 days General
Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 14/12/1940 15/01/1941 33 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 17/12/1941 08/02/1942 54 days General
Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 22/04/1943 06/07/1943 76 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/03/1944 05/04/1944 19 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 21/11/1944 21/12/1944 31 days General
Boiler number 9464 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 08/02/1947 22/03/1947 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1947 09/08/1947 32 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 06/01/1949 28/01/1949 23 days General
Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63481
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 463
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22061
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3481    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/04/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63481 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev