Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 127 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 127 Week
» 22633 Month
» 325823 Year
» 1547388 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 464 m/e 05/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3464   25/10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3482   19/05/1946
British Railways 63482 w/e 17/06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O305/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22062
To Service During 05/1919 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Mon 21/01/1952 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping During 01/1952 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) m/e 05/1919
NWE New England on 17/03/1925
GRA Grantham on 20/11/1942
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
IMM Immingham on 30/05/1948
36A Doncaster on 25/06/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 27/08/1950
   Withdrawn on 21/01/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 27/08/1950
WDN   on 21/01/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7513)
25/10/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7515)
14/03/1929 Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
07/04/1931 Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
07/04/1931 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7708)
23/09/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7504)
15/12/1939 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7509)
18/04/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7505)
09/06/1944 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8184)
19/06/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9468)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 06/04/1921 16/07/1921 102 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/06/1924 25/10/1924 135 days General
Boiler number 7515 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3464
 
Doncaster Works 07/08/1926 02/12/1926 118 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/01/1929 14/03/1929 69 days General
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
 
Doncaster Works 01/01/1931 07/04/1931 97 days General
Boiler number 7708 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1933 23/09/1933 114 days General
Boiler number 7504 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 08/05/1935 01/07/1935 55 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/03/1937 27/05/1937 69 days No repairs
Not repaired
 
Doncaster Works 20/09/1937 30/10/1937 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/11/1939 15/12/1939 43 days General
Boiler number 7509 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/01/1942 18/04/1942 83 days General
Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 11/05/1944 09/06/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 28/08/1945 29/09/1945 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/05/1947 23/07/1947 81 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/05/1950 19/06/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 9468 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63482
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 464
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22062
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
06/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1921. Dep: 16/07/1921.    
13/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7515 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3464
   
17/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
07/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1926. Dep: 02/12/1926.    
05/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1929. Dep: 14/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
   
01/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1931. Dep: 07/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7708 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
   
02/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1933. Dep: 23/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7504 (Diagram 2)
   
08/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1935. Dep: 01/07/1935.    
20/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 27/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
   
20/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.    
03/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1939. Dep: 15/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7509 (Diagram 2)
   
26/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2)
   
20/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
11/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1944. Dep: 09/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
19/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3482    
04/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1947. Dep: 23/07/1947.    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
30/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
14/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1950. Dep: 19/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9468 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63482
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
21/01/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 63482 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev