Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1012 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2046 Week
» 24552 Month
» 327742 Year
» 1549307 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 465 m/e 05/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3465   21/02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3483   20/10/1946
British Railways 63483 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O305/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22063
To Service During 05/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 02/04/1951 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 04/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 05/1919
DON Doncaster on 17/01/1936
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 02/04/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 02/04/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7514)
21/02/1925 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7511)
02/03/1931 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7516)
11/11/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7502)
19/03/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7690)
13/04/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8855)
27/06/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9361)
17/12/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9162)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 16/09/1921 19/01/1922 126 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/10/1924 21/02/1925 115 days General
Boiler number 7511 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3465
 
Doncaster Works 19/02/1927 02/06/1927 104 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1928 07/09/1928 61 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/12/1930 02/03/1931 87 days General
Boiler number 7516 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1933 11/11/1933 107 days General
Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/11/1935 21/12/1935 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/01/1936 17/01/1936 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/01/1938 19/03/1938 51 days General
Boiler number 7690 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 02/03/1940 13/04/1940 43 days General
Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 17/05/1942 27/06/1942 42 days General
Boiler number 9361 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 21/12/1942 10/02/1943 52 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Doncaster Works 02/09/1944 03/10/1944 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/12/1944 24/01/1945 28 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 16/05/1946 24/08/1946 101 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/03/1948 15/04/1948 38 days General
Renumbered to BR 63483
 
Doncaster Works 13/11/1948 17/12/1948 35 days Heavy
Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 465
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22063
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
16/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1921. Dep: 19/01/1922.    
30/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1924. Dep: 21/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7511 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3465
   
19/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 02/06/1927.    
09/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1928. Dep: 07/09/1928.    
06/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1930. Dep: 02/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7516 (Diagram 2)
   
28/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2)
   
15/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935.    
03/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1936. Dep: 17/01/1936.    
17/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7690 (Diagram 2)
   
02/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8855 (Diagram 2)
   
17/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9361 (Diagram 2)
   
21/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1942. Dep: 10/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
02/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1944. Dep: 03/10/1944.    
28/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1944. Dep: 24/01/1945.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
16/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3483    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1948. Dep: 15/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63483
   
13/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 17/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2)
   
02/04/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63483 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev