Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 177 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 177 Week
» 14081 Month
» 322062 Year
» 1206443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 466 m/e 05/1919
LNER (1924) 3466   10/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3484   20/10/1946
BR 63484 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O305/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22064
To Service During 05/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Tue 16/12/1952 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 12/1952 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 33 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 05/1919
DON Doncaster 14/12/1937
FRO Frodingham 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster 18/01/1948
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 25/02/1951
36A Doncaster 17/08/1952
   Withdrawn 16/12/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 25/02/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 06/09/1952
WDN   16/12/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7515)
10/05/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7716)
11/01/1929 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7504)
04/02/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7525)
31/05/1935 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8819)
25/04/1941 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9248)
04/10/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4402)
17/11/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 21007)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 07/04/1921 09/07/1921 94 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/01/1924 10/05/1924 131 days General
Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3466
 
Doncaster Works 09/07/1926 24/11/1926 139 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/11/1928 11/01/1929 65 days General
Boiler number 7504 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 19/09/1930 21/11/1930 64 days General  
Gorton Works 01/11/1932 04/02/1933 96 days General
Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1933 06/10/1933 140 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 09/03/1935 31/05/1935 84 days Heavy
Boiler number 8819 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/05/1936 01/07/1936 54 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/02/1937 16/04/1937 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/01/1939 25/03/1939 56 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/03/1941 25/04/1941 33 days General
Boiler number 9248 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 27/03/1943 01/05/1943 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/02/1945 03/04/1945 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/11/1946 04/01/1947 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/09/1948 04/10/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 4402 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63484
 
Doncaster Works 24/10/1950 17/11/1950 25 days General
Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 05/04/1951 01/05/1951 27 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as GNR Number 466
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22064
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
07/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1921. Dep: 09/07/1921.    
01/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3466
   
09/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1926. Dep: 24/11/1926.    
08/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1928. Dep: 11/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7504 (Diagram 2)
   
19/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1930. Dep: 21/11/1930.    
01/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1932. Dep: 04/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2)
   
20/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 06/10/1933.    
09/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 31/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8819 (Diagram 2)
   
09/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 01/07/1936.    
12/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1937. Dep: 16/04/1937.    
14/12/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.    
24/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1941. Dep: 25/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9248 (Diagram 2)
   
27/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943.    
18/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1945. Dep: 03/04/1945.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3484    
29/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947.    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1948. Dep: 04/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4402 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63484
   
24/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1950. Dep: 17/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 21007 (Diagram 2)
   
25/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
05/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1951. Dep: 01/05/1951.    
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
12/1952 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
16/12/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 63484 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev