Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 162 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 162 Week
» 22668 Month
» 325858 Year
» 1547423 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 467 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3467   30/08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3485   10/11/1946
British Railways 63485 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O306/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22065
To Service During 06/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Wed 26/09/1951 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 09/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 32 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 06/1919
GRA Grantham on 20/11/1942
NWE New England on 12/03/1944
GRA Grantham on 30/09/1944
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 26/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   on 26/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7516)
30/08/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7720)
27/06/1929 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7716)
21/10/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7708)
23/11/1939 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7711)
22/01/1942 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8857)
29/07/1944 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8976)
10/08/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4403)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 15/10/1921 28/01/1922 106 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/04/1924 30/08/1924 148 days General
Boiler number 7720 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3467
 
Doncaster Works 18/01/1927 28/04/1927 101 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/05/1929 27/06/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 24/02/1931 12/06/1931 109 days General  
Gorton Works 28/07/1933 21/10/1933 86 days General
Boiler number 7708 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/07/1935 30/08/1935 53 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/04/1937 15/06/1937 75 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/09/1939 23/11/1939 59 days General
Boiler number 7711 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/12/1941 22/01/1942 53 days General
Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/03/1942 10/04/1942 24 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/06/1944 29/07/1944 48 days General
Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 01/08/1944 10/08/1944 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 16/06/1946 10/08/1946 56 days General
Boiler number 4403 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 08/07/1948 19/08/1948 43 days General
Renumbered to BR 63485
 
Doncaster Works 14/10/1949 09/11/1949 27 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 467
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22065
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
15/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1921. Dep: 28/01/1922.    
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7720 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3467
   
18/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1927. Dep: 28/04/1927.    
09/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1929. Dep: 27/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2)
   
24/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1931. Dep: 12/06/1931.    
28/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7708 (Diagram 2)
   
09/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1935. Dep: 30/08/1935.    
02/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 15/06/1937.    
26/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1939. Dep: 23/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7711 (Diagram 2)
   
01/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 22/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2)
   
18/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1942. Dep: 10/04/1942.    
20/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
12/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2)
   
01/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944.    
30/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
16/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4403 (Diagram 2)
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3485    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1948. Dep: 19/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63485
   
14/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1949. Dep: 09/11/1949.    
26/09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63485 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev