|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1921 | 28/01/1922 | 106 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1924 | 30/08/1924 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 7720 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3467 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1927 | 28/04/1927 | 101 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1929 | 27/06/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1931 | 12/06/1931 | 109 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1933 | 21/10/1933 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 7708 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1935 | 30/08/1935 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1937 | 15/06/1937 | 75 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1939 | 23/11/1939 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 7711 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1941 | 22/01/1942 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1942 | 10/04/1942 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1944 | 29/07/1944 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1944 | 10/08/1944 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1946 | 10/08/1946 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 4403 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1948 | 19/08/1948 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63485 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1949 | 09/11/1949 | 27 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 467 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22065 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
15/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1921. Dep: 28/01/1922. | ||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7720 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3467 |
||
18/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1927. Dep: 28/04/1927. | ||
09/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1929. Dep: 27/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2) |
||
24/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1931. Dep: 12/06/1931. | ||
28/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7708 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1935. Dep: 30/08/1935. | ||
02/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 15/06/1937. | ||
26/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1939. Dep: 23/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7711 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 22/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8857 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1942. Dep: 10/04/1942. | ||
20/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
12/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
12/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944. | ||
30/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
16/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4403 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3485 | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1948. Dep: 19/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63485 |
||
14/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1949. Dep: 09/11/1949. | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
09/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
26/09/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63485 from Doncaster (36A) |