Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1008 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2042 Week
» 24548 Month
» 327738 Year
» 1549303 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 468 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3468   27/02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3486   17/11/1946
British Railways 63486 w/e 18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O306/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22066
To Service During 06/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 05/02/1951 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 02/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 06/1919
CLK Colwick on 28/11/1925
NWE New England on 12/07/1929
GRA Grantham on 19/11/1942
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 05/02/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 36A Doncaster on 05/02/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7517)
07/05/1927 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7512)
08/12/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7516)
21/10/1937 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9016)
07/09/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8461)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 13/10/1921 04/03/1922 143 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/10/1924 27/02/1925 121 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3468
 
Doncaster Works 10/01/1927 07/05/1927 118 days General
Boiler number 7512 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/04/1929 21/06/1929 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/12/1930 23/02/1931 69 days General  
Gorton Works 26/07/1933 08/12/1933 136 days General
Boiler number 7516 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/05/1935 06/07/1935 53 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/04/1937 27/05/1937 57 days No repairs  
Doncaster Works 19/09/1937 21/10/1937 33 days General
Boiler number 9016 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 07/03/1940 20/04/1940 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/01/1942 20/03/1942 63 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/06/1944 04/07/1944 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1946 07/09/1946 61 days General
Boiler number 8461 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 07/08/1948 18/09/1948 43 days General
Renumbered to BR 63486
 
Doncaster Works 01/01/1951 01/01/1951 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 468
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22066
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
13/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1921. Dep: 04/03/1922.    
30/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1924. Dep: 27/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3468
   
28/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7512 (Diagram 2)
   
26/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1929. Dep: 21/06/1929.    
12/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
17/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1930. Dep: 23/02/1931.    
26/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1933. Dep: 08/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7516 (Diagram 2)
   
15/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935.    
01/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/04/1937. Dep: 27/05/1937.    
19/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1937. Dep: 21/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9016 (Diagram 2)
   
07/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940.    
17/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1942. Dep: 20/03/1942.    
19/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
02/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1944. Dep: 04/07/1944.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
09/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8461 (Diagram 2)
   
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3486    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63486
   
01/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/01/1951. Dep: 01/01/1951.    
05/02/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63486 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev