Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 189 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 22695 Month
» 325885 Year
» 1547450 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 469 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3469   25/06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3487   28/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O306/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22067
To Service During 06/1919 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Fri 04/07/1947 off Frodingham (FRO)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) m/e 06/1919
NWE New England on 13/03/1925
CLK Colwick on 27/11/1925
NWE New England on 09/08/1934
CLK Colwick on 09/10/1934
NWE New England on 08/11/1934
GRA Grantham on 14/11/1942
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
   Withdrawn on 04/07/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7518)
25/04/1925 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7516)
20/06/1930 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7234)
02/03/1935 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7507)
03/02/1943 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8186)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 08/12/1921 16/10/1922 313 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/01/1925 25/04/1925 102 days General
Boiler number 7516 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 17/08/1927 30/11/1927 106 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/04/1930 20/06/1930 73 days General
Boiler number 7234 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 28/11/1931 25/02/1932 90 days General  
Gorton Works 29/12/1934 02/03/1935 64 days General
Boiler number 7507 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 11/01/1937 22/03/1937 71 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/04/1939 30/06/1939 75 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/01/1941 22/02/1941 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/12/1942 03/02/1943 59 days General
Boiler number 8186 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 07/07/1944 21/07/1944 15 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 24/11/1946 24/11/1946 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 469
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22067
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
08/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1921. Dep: 16/10/1922.    
14/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7516 (Diagram 2)
   
13/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
25/06/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 3469    
27/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1927. Dep: 30/11/1927.    
09/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1930. Dep: 20/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7234 (Diagram 2)
   
28/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 25/02/1932.    
09/08/1934 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
09/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
29/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1934. Dep: 02/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7507 (Diagram 2)
   
11/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1937. Dep: 22/03/1937.    
17/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1939. Dep: 30/06/1939.    
25/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941.    
14/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
07/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1942. Dep: 03/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8186 (Diagram 2)
   
07/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/07/1944. Dep: 21/07/1944.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3487    
24/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/11/1946. Dep: 24/11/1946.    
04/07/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 3487 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev