Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1071 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2105 Week
» 24611 Month
» 327801 Year
» 1549366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 470 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3470   18/10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3488   23/09/1946
British Railways 63488 w/e 31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O306/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22068
To Service During 06/1919 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Fri 22/02/1952 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Thu 28/02/1952 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) m/e 06/1919
NWE New England on 17/03/1925
GRA Grantham on 21/11/1942
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 03/12/1950
   Withdrawn on 22/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   on 18/02/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/02/0451 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9467)
06/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7519)
18/10/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7719)
25/11/1931 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7506)
24/02/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7717)
18/01/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4403)
03/08/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9466)
13/07/1950 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8184)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 27/03/1922 19/08/1922 146 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/06/1924 18/10/1924 116 days General
Boiler number 7719 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3470
 
Doncaster Works 15/07/1926 20/11/1926 129 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/03/1927 05/04/1927 34 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/12/1928 21/02/1929 75 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/09/1931 25/11/1931 63 days General
Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1933 24/02/1934 108 days General
Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 22/11/1935 04/01/1936 44 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/12/1937 18/01/1938 21 days General
Boiler number 4403 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 25/03/1940 08/05/1940 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/07/1942 30/07/1942 21 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/01/1945 23/02/1945 44 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/06/1946 21/09/1946 84 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/06/1948 03/08/1948 48 days General
Boiler number 9466 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63488
 
Doncaster Works 10/06/1950 13/07/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 13/02/1952 13/02/1952 1 day No repairs
For general repair & also conversion to oil burning but partially dismantled prior to temporary use
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/02/0451 Modification Diagram 2 number 9467 boiler fitted    
06/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 470
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22068
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
27/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1922. Dep: 19/08/1922.    
25/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7719 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3470
   
17/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
15/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926.    
03/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1927. Dep: 05/04/1927.    
09/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1928. Dep: 21/02/1929.    
24/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1931. Dep: 25/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2)
   
09/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1933. Dep: 24/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2)
   
22/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1935. Dep: 04/01/1936.    
29/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1937. Dep: 18/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4403 (Diagram 2)
   
25/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1940. Dep: 08/05/1940.    
10/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1942. Dep: 30/07/1942.    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
11/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1945. Dep: 23/02/1945.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
30/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.    
23/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3488    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 03/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9466 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63488
   
10/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1950. Dep: 13/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2)
   
03/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/02/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
For general repair & also conversion to oil burning but partially dismantled prior to temporary use
   
22/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 63488 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev