Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 419 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1758 Week
» 31256 Month
» 368102 Year
» 1589667 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 471 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3471   09/08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3489   10/09/1946
British Railways 63489   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O306/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22069
To Service During 06/1919 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Thu 22/07/1948 off Doncaster (DON)
Scrapping During 07/1948 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) m/e 06/1919
NWE New England on 16/03/1925
DON Doncaster on 23/11/1940
GRA Grantham on 21/11/1942
NWE New England on 22/09/1944
GRA Grantham on 30/09/1944
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 22/07/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7520)
09/08/1924 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7718)
30/09/1932 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8186)
17/08/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7714)
15/06/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4404)
29/01/1944 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8456)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 26/07/1921 05/11/1921 103 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/01/1923 28/04/1923 103 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/04/1924 09/08/1924 117 days General
Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3471
 
Doncaster Works 19/10/1926 03/02/1927 108 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/12/1928 01/02/1929 63 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/07/1930 06/10/1930 71 days General  
Gorton Works 28/04/1932 30/09/1932 156 days General
Boiler number 8186 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 14/08/1934 21/09/1934 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/05/1936 15/07/1936 61 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/07/1938 17/08/1938 30 days General
Boiler number 7714 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 20/05/1940 15/06/1940 27 days General
Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 06/02/1942 16/04/1942 70 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/12/1943 29/01/1944 37 days General
Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 12/11/1946 21/12/1946 40 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/06/1948 25/06/1948 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 471
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22069
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
26/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921.    
16/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1923. Dep: 28/04/1923.    
15/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3471
   
16/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
19/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1926. Dep: 03/02/1927.    
01/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 01/02/1929.    
28/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1930. Dep: 06/10/1930.    
28/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1932. Dep: 30/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8186 (Diagram 2)
   
14/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1934. Dep: 21/09/1934.    
16/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 15/07/1936.    
19/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1938. Dep: 17/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7714 (Diagram 2)
   
20/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1942. Dep: 16/04/1942.    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
24/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1943. Dep: 29/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2)
   
22/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
30/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
10/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3489    
12/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63489 but not taken up    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/06/1948. Dep: 25/06/1948.    
22/07/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 3489 from Doncaster (DON)    

prev prev