Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 135 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 135 Week
» 22641 Month
» 325831 Year
» 1547396 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 472 m/e 10/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3472   14/02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3490   17/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O310/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22099
To Service During 10/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Thu 19/06/1947 off Frodingham (FRO)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 10/1919
GRA Grantham on 21/11/1942
DON Doncaster on 01/08/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
   Withdrawn on 19/06/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7521)
12/08/1927 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7517)
24/11/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7523)
29/09/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8182)
04/09/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8185)
16/05/1943 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8458)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 20/04/1922 30/09/1922 164 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/10/1924 14/02/1925 111 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3472
 
Doncaster Works 31/10/1925 20/02/1926 113 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 13/05/1927 12/08/1927 92 days General
Boiler number 7517 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 10/11/1929 15/01/1930 67 days General  
Gorton Works 04/10/1932 21/01/1933 110 days General  
Gorton Works 12/10/1934 24/11/1934 44 days General
Boiler number 7523 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 14/09/1936 16/10/1936 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/08/1938 29/09/1938 35 days General
Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 26/07/1940 04/09/1940 41 days General
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 12/04/1941 06/06/1941 56 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/04/1943 16/05/1943 36 days General
Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 13/06/1945 01/08/1945 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/05/1946 17/07/1946 58 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/05/1947 25/05/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 472
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22099
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
20/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1922. Dep: 30/09/1922.    
27/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1924. Dep: 14/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3472
   
31/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926.    
13/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1927. Dep: 12/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7517 (Diagram 2)
   
10/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1929. Dep: 15/01/1930.    
04/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1932. Dep: 21/01/1933.    
12/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7523 (Diagram 2)
   
14/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1936. Dep: 16/10/1936.    
26/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1938. Dep: 29/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2)
   
26/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1940. Dep: 04/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
   
12/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1941. Dep: 06/06/1941.    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
11/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1943. Dep: 16/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2)
   
13/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1945. Dep: 01/08/1945.    
01/08/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
21/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1946. Dep: 17/07/1946.    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3490    
25/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/05/1947. Dep: 25/05/1947.    
19/06/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 3490 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev