Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 29 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1701 Week
» 20022 Month
» 108214 Year
» 992595 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 473 m/e 10/1919
LNER (1924) 3473   22/11/1924
LNER (1946) 3491   17/11/1946
BR 63491 w/e 04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O310/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22100
To Service During 10/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 18/12/1950 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 12/1950 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 10/1919
GRA Grantham 21/11/1942
DON Doncaster 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn 18/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/01/1948
WDN   18/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7522)
20/07/1927 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7235)
25/10/1929 Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
30/04/1932 Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
25/08/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7714)
03/08/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7707)
14/08/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8460)
07/12/1946 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8822)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 21/03/1922 25/08/1922 158 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/07/1924 22/11/1924 120 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3473
 
Doncaster Works 23/01/1925 14/02/1925 23 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 01/04/1927 20/07/1927 111 days General
Boiler number 7235 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 17/08/1929 25/10/1929 70 days General
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1932 30/04/1932 103 days General
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1934 25/08/1934 68 days General
Boiler number 7714 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 29/03/1936 09/05/1936 42 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/08/1937 25/09/1937 47 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/07/1938 03/08/1938 32 days General
Boiler number 7707 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/07/1940 14/08/1940 43 days General
Boiler number 8460 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 09/09/1940 20/12/1940 103 days Heavy
Air raid damage
 
Doncaster Works 25/01/1943 03/03/1943 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/08/1944 23/09/1944 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/10/1946 07/12/1946 41 days General
Boiler number 8822 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3491
 
Doncaster Works 20/10/1948 06/12/1948 48 days General
Renumbered to BR 63491
 
Doncaster Works 11/01/1949 14/02/1949 35 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 24/11/1950 24/11/1950 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as GNR Number 473
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22100
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
21/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1922. Dep: 25/08/1922.    
26/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1924. Dep: 22/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3473
   
23/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1925. Dep: 14/02/1925.    
01/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1927. Dep: 20/07/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7235 (Diagram 2)
   
17/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 25/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
   
19/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
   
19/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7714 (Diagram 2)
   
29/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.    
10/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937.    
03/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1938. Dep: 03/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7707 (Diagram 2)
   
03/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1940. Dep: 14/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8460 (Diagram 2)
   
09/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/09/1940. Dep: 20/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Air raid damage
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
25/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1943. Dep: 03/03/1943.    
25/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
28/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8822 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3491
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1948. Dep: 06/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63491
   
11/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1949. Dep: 14/02/1949.    
24/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/11/1950. Dep: 24/11/1950.    
12/1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
18/12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 63491 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev