Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 166 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 166 Week
» 22672 Month
» 325862 Year
» 1547427 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 474 m/e 10/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3474   29/11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3492   17/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O310/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22101
To Service During 10/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sat 10/05/1947 off Frodingham (FRO)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 10/1919
DON Doncaster on 22/01/1938
GRA Grantham on 06/05/1945
DON Doncaster on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
   Withdrawn on 10/05/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7523)
01/12/1928 Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
01/12/1928 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7505)
22/01/1931 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7503)
22/01/1931 Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
31/03/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7521)
23/02/1935 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7690)
15/01/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 4402)
06/05/1944 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9013)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 18/01/1922 13/05/1922 116 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/08/1924 29/11/1924 110 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3474
 
Doncaster Works 20/04/1925 30/05/1925 41 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1926 09/11/1926 124 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/09/1928 01/12/1928 70 days General
Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
 
Doncaster Works 13/11/1930 22/01/1931 71 days General
Boiler number 7503 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1932 31/03/1933 103 days General
Boiler number 7521 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1933 07/07/1933 54 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 03/01/1935 23/02/1935 52 days General
Boiler number 7690 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 27/11/1935 15/01/1936 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/12/1937 15/01/1935 -1069 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/12/1939 05/02/1940 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/12/1941 12/02/1942 55 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/11/1942 23/12/1942 44 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Doncaster Works 07/04/1944 06/05/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 9013 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 23/09/1945 26/10/1945 34 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/03/1947 22/03/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 474
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22101
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
18/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922.    
12/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3474
   
20/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1925. Dep: 30/05/1925.    
09/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1926. Dep: 09/11/1926.    
23/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
   
13/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1930. Dep: 22/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7503 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
   
19/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1932. Dep: 31/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7521 (Diagram 2)
   
15/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1933. Dep: 07/07/1933.    
03/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7690 (Diagram 2)
   
27/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1935. Dep: 15/01/1936.    
20/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1937. Dep: 15/01/1935.    
15/01/1938 Modification Diagram 2 number 4402 boiler fitted    
22/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1939. Dep: 05/02/1940.    
20/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1941. Dep: 12/02/1942.    
10/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1942. Dep: 23/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
07/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9013 (Diagram 2)
   
06/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1945. Dep: 26/10/1945.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3492    
22/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.    
10/05/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 3492 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev