Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 762 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3448 Week
» 4338 Month
» 312319 Year
» 1196700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 475 m/e 10/1919
LNER (1924) 3475   11/04/1925
LNER (1946) 3493   15/12/1946
BR 63493 w/e 24/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O310/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22102
To Service During 10/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 19/02/1951 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 02/1951 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 10/1919
CLK Colwick 27/11/1925
NWE New England 09/08/1934
CLK Colwick 08/10/1934
NWE New England 08/11/1934
DON Doncaster 23/11/1940
FRO Frodingham 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn 19/02/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/01/1948
WDN 36A Doncaster 19/02/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7524)
01/12/1927 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7525)
10/05/1930 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7502)
18/02/1933 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7718)
07/01/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8185)
26/07/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8184)
21/06/1943 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8856)
04/01/1945 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9162)
22/07/1948 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8182)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 16/02/1922 19/06/1922 124 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/11/1924 11/04/1925 135 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3475
 
Doncaster Works 09/07/1927 01/12/1927 146 days General
Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 12/03/1930 10/05/1930 60 days General
Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1932 18/02/1933 100 days General
Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 15/11/1935 23/12/1935 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/12/1937 07/01/1938 28 days General
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 29/06/1940 26/07/1940 28 days General
Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/07/1942 14/08/1942 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/05/1943 21/06/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 03/10/1944 03/11/1944 32 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 11/12/1944 04/01/1945 25 days Heavy
Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 16/07/1946 26/09/1946 73 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/01/1947 24/03/1947 62 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/06/1948 22/07/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63493
 
Doncaster Works 05/11/1949 13/12/1949 39 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as GNR Number 475
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22102
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
16/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1922. Dep: 19/06/1922.    
28/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1924. Dep: 11/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3475
   
27/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 01/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2)
   
12/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7502 (Diagram 2)
   
11/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1932. Dep: 18/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7718 (Diagram 2)
   
09/08/1934 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
08/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
15/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1935. Dep: 23/12/1935.    
11/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 07/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2)
   
29/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 26/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1942. Dep: 14/08/1942.    
28/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1943. Dep: 21/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8856 (Diagram 2)
   
03/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 03/11/1944.    
11/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/12/1944. Dep: 04/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
16/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1946. Dep: 26/09/1946.    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3493    
22/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1947. Dep: 24/03/1947.    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 22/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8182 (Diagram 2)
Renumbered to BR 63493
   
05/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/11/1949. Dep: 13/12/1949.    
02/1951 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
19/02/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63493 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev