Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1043 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2077 Week
» 24583 Month
» 327773 Year
» 1549338 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Northern Railway 476 m/e 10/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3476   05/12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3494   27/10/1946
British Railways 63494   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class O3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O310/1919
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 22103
To Service During 10/1919 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Fri 05/03/1948 off Doncaster (DON)
Scrapping During 03/1948 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) m/e 10/1919
DON Doncaster on 12/07/1939
FRO Frodingham on 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 05/03/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7525)
18/11/1922 Worthington pump fitted
12/05/1927 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7520)
12/05/1927 Worthington pump removed
26/09/1929 Silvertow mechanical lubricator fitted
26/09/1929 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7720)
26/09/1929 Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
25/06/1932 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7510)
25/06/1932 Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
08/07/1938 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number G982)
27/11/1944 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 9462)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 18/04/1922 18/11/1922 215 days General
Worthington pump fitted
 
Doncaster Works 27/06/1924 05/12/1924 162 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3476
 
Doncaster Works 23/05/1926 23/06/1926 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/01/1927 12/05/1927 115 days General
Boiler number 7520 (Diagram 2)
Worthington pump removed
 
Doncaster Works 09/08/1929 26/09/1929 49 days General
Boiler number 7720 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1932 25/06/1932 96 days General
Boiler number 7510 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1934 07/07/1934 60 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/05/1936 02/07/1936 56 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/05/1938 08/07/1938 47 days General
Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 31/01/1940 02/03/1940 32 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 21/07/1940 28/08/1940 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/09/1942 05/11/1942 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/10/1944 27/11/1944 32 days General
Boiler number 9462 (Diagram 2)
 
Doncaster Works 18/02/1946 30/03/1946 41 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 30/08/1946 19/10/1946 51 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/02/1948 17/02/1948 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 476
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22103
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 2 boiler fitted
   
18/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922.
Work undertaken:
Worthington pump fitted
   
27/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1924. Dep: 05/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3476
   
23/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1926. Dep: 23/06/1926.    
18/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1927. Dep: 12/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7520 (Diagram 2)
Worthington pump removed
   
09/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1929. Dep: 26/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7720 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater fitted
   
22/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7510 (Diagram 2)
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed
   
09/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934.    
08/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1936. Dep: 02/07/1936.    
23/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1938. Dep: 08/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2)
   
12/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
31/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940.    
21/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1940. Dep: 28/08/1940.    
29/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1942. Dep: 05/11/1942.    
27/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1944. Dep: 27/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9462 (Diagram 2)
   
18/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
30/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946.    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3494    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63494 but not taken up    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/02/1948. Dep: 17/02/1948.    
05/03/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 3494 from Doncaster (DON)    

prev