Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 57 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7511 Week
» 10093 Month
» 274726 Year
» 1496291 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 966 m/e 09/1911
LNER (1924) 5966   21/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3500   14/12/1946
LNER (1947) 3572 on 02/02/1947
BR 63572 w/e 11/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 09/1911
Withdrawal Wed 18/11/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 48 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Robinson 18 element superheater from new

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1911
GOR Gorton on 14/10/1921
IMM Immingham on 05/07/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 18/12/1926
DON Doncaster on 07/04/1941
FRO Frodingham on 25/07/1943
DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946
FRO Frodingham on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 18/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 03/12/1945
WDN   on 18/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1429)
06/05/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1519)
03/09/1921 Ross Pop
03/09/1921 Diagram GCR1 boiler fitted (number 118)
21/06/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1455)
29/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1444)
15/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1273)
15/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1874)
20/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1955)
20/07/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
21/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1026)
22/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3334)
28/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3251)
12/08/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3285)
14/12/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3284)
11/06/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3321)
17/11/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22228)
20/03/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22129)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/03/1916 06/05/1916 57 days General
Boiler number 1519 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 03/09/1921 176 days General
Boiler number 118 (Diagram GCR1)
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 21/06/1924 141 days General
Reversion to 8K boiler
Boiler number 1455 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5966
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1926 21/08/1926 64 days General  
Gorton Works 06/10/1928 29/12/1928 85 days General
Boiler number 1444 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1930 15/11/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1933 15/04/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1935 20/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1937 21/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1940 22/06/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1942 28/11/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1944 12/08/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1946 14/12/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3500
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1949 11/06/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63572
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1951 17/11/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1954 20/03/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22129 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1956 06/10/1956 29 days General  
Gorton Works 10/11/1956 17/11/1956 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/01/1958 23/02/1958 30 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 16/11/1959 16/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 966
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
11/03/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1916. Dep: 06/05/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1519 (Diagram 15)
   
12/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 03/09/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 118 (Diagram GCR1)
Ross Pop
   
14/10/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Reversion to 8K boiler
Boiler number 1455 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5966
   
05/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
19/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1926. Dep: 21/08/1926.    
18/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
06/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1928. Dep: 29/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1444 (Diagram 15)
   
25/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 15/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 15/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
07/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
   
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
29/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3500
   
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3572    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
21/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63572
   
03/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15)
   
27/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22129 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1956. Dep: 06/10/1956.    
10/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956.    
25/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1958. Dep: 23/02/1958.    
16/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 16/11/1959.    
18/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63572 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev