|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/09/1919 | 01/11/1919 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1921 | 03/02/1922 | 378 days | General | Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1923 | 23/07/1923 | 67 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1925 | 15/06/1925 | 63 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5331 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1928 | 07/03/1928 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 1706 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1930 | 05/06/1930 | 62 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1932 | 07/01/1933 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1936 | 25/04/1936 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1164 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1939 | 31/05/1939 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1942 | 07/11/1942 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3290 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1947 | 17/11/1947 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1950 | 28/10/1950 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 22123 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63585 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1950 | 05/11/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1952 | 28/10/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1954 | 18/12/1954 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 22238 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1957 | 26/09/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1960 | 08/09/1960 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22896 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 331 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
30/03/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
20/09/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1919. Dep: 01/11/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 279 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1921. Dep: 03/02/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
18/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1923. Dep: 23/07/1923. | ||
14/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1925. Dep: 15/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5331 |
||
12/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1928. Dep: 07/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1706 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 05/06/1930. | ||
30/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1936. Dep: 25/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1164 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
27/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1939. Dep: 31/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3290 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3504 | ||
24/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3585 | ||
28/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1947. Dep: 17/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
08/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22123 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63585 |
||
02/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1950. Dep: 05/11/1950. | ||
21/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 28/10/1952. | ||
19/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22238 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1957. Dep: 26/09/1957. | ||
12/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
09/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1960. Dep: 08/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22896 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
19/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63585 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |